Trustees THE BRAUGHING PLAYING FIELD ASSOCIATION TRUST
Charity number: 302344
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Nigel Banks | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Nathan Tye | Trustee | 07 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Donald Hobson | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Graham Frary | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Courtney | Trustee | 07 March 2000 |
|
|
||||
KEELY JILL COUSINS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.