Trustees 1ST CUFFLEY SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 302555
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID HOLT | Chair | 26 October 2012 |
|
|||||
David White | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Jackson | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Crowdy | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Scott | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lodge | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Sartori | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Lodge | Trustee | 04 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Pearson | Trustee | 16 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Steven Rowsell | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Diane Cracknell | Trustee | 01 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR DAVID ALAN GILL | Trustee | 16 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
LYNN SAMUELSON | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
PETER DAVID CRACKNELL | Trustee | 26 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEAN HOLT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ELIZABETH JOSEPHINE WARD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.