Trustees THE BUCKDEN RECREATION GROUND AND VILLAGE HALL TRUST
Charity number: 302629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cynthia Alers | Chair | 05 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Ce Walker | Trustee | 01 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Freeman | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Catherine Beldam | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Matthew Richard Beldam | Trustee | 02 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Squire | Trustee | 23 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Michael Lander | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|||||
Hamish Vaughan Masson | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR MEWS | Trustee | 03 January 2012 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY COOK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEVIN J LOAKES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.