Trustees BORSTAL VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 302688
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUSTIN PETER WADHAMS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Martin Helmore | Trustee | 24 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
LINDA HILL | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Johnstone | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr katherine marie bradley | Trustee | 13 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
mark wilkes | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROSALINDJOHNSTONE | Trustee | 17 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET SAWYER | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
TUDOR SAWYER | Trustee | 09 December 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.