Trustees CHARING PLAYING FIELD
Charity number: 302707
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Hacket | Trustee | 24 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Rutledge | Trustee | 02 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gary Fentiman | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Martyn James Morgan | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Jolly | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meg Lawrence | Trustee | 16 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Philip Smith | Trustee | 19 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Patrick Hurst | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROWENA MUNDAY | Trustee | 01 February 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.