Trustees CHIDDINGSTONE CAUSEWAY VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 302713
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROWLAND JOHN POCOCK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BALDOCK | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Ewer | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Foster | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Barnden | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
WENDY HOLLANDS | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUE KIBBLEWHITE | Trustee | 03 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS RAYMOND WARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRYAN HOLLANDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUE HEWLETT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.