Trustees JAH-JIREH CHARITY HOMES
Charity number: 1062023
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEFFREY STACEY | Chair | 03 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mark Donnelly | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
LEE CHADWICK | Trustee | 05 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Cockshott | Trustee | 12 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Robin Telles | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Charles Bland | Trustee | 25 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
PHIL CUTTING | Trustee | 28 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Charles STRINGER FCA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RUSSELL WHITCOMBE JONES | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.