Trustees ROUNDSWELL COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1063837
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DAVID EADIE | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neil Marsden | Trustee | 20 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Val Howell | Trustee | 23 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Pam Harman | Trustee | 21 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Fleetwood | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan Bater | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pam Truluck | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jack Bater | Trustee | 17 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Howell | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.