Governance 7TH HILLINGDON AIR SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 303721
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
- 04 June 1964: Standard registration
- 11 November 2008: Removed (Does not operate)
- 07 January 2013: Re-registered
- 09 September 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 September 2017: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.