Trustees BROOKE VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 303915
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Harrison | Chair | 24 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Jinks | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Pitelen | Trustee | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joh Friswell | Trustee | 24 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Hankinson | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Dixon | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Riley | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN TOBIN | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Steve Mears | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN TIMEWELL | Trustee | 09 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
ISHBEL LOCHHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET JOAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAGGIE SADLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ALAN BEESON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAGGIE WORMALL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.