Trustees TAVERHAM VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304086
Charity reporting is overdue by 265 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Warnes | Chair | 21 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Linda Barrington - Smith | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sean Daniels | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Daniels | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Lutkin | Trustee | 19 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Clarke | Trustee | 02 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Ward | Trustee | 20 July 2017 |
|
|||||
Julie Peach | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Connolly | Trustee | 17 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA CLAPSON | Trustee | 11 October 2012 |
|
|||||
MARGARET CALVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JEAN WEIKERT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SUSAN MILLAR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DENNIS CALVER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET LATCHFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STELLA NEWSTEAD | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.