Trustees THE BOUGHTON VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 304162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Jane Callis | Chair | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Michael Boyce | Trustee | 02 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Mackaness | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Lesley Chappell | Trustee | 04 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Steven Deane | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Karen Fletcher | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JENNY BULLOCK | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.