Governing document NORTH OXFORD ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23RD OCTOBER 1969, AS AMENDED 29TH DECEMBER 1970, 21ST JUNE 1979, 12TH NOVEMBER 1992 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19/11/2015
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO: (A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA NORTH OF ST GILES FROM THE CITY CENTRE, BETWEEN THE RIVERS CHERWELL AND THAMES, UP TO THE CITY BOUNDARY IN THE NORTH (HEREINAFTER CALLED ‘THE AREA OF BENEFIT’) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, NATIONALITY, AGE, DISABILIUTY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THOSE WHO VISIT THE CENTRE (SEE (B) BELOW) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT, OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED ‘THE CENTRE’) AND TO OCCUPY, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS; AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITY FOR THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
OXFORD CITY IN THE AREA NORTH OF ST GILES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.