Trustees WIVELISCOMBE WAR MEMORIAL RECREATION GROUND
Charity number: 304684
Charity reporting is up to date (78 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvia Ashton Cottrell | Trustee | 13 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Keal | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daryl Smith | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Bruce Keay | Trustee | 18 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Porter Treasurer | Trustee | 20 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Quick | Trustee | 01 January 2010 |
|
|
||||
ERIC GEORGE KIDNER Secretary | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.