Trustees NORTH HOLMWOOD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 305157
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Foskett | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Michael Steven Foskett | Trustee | 26 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Steenhuis | Trustee | 21 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennie Louise Lambert | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Leah Edwards | Trustee | 06 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thomas William Peter Nimmo | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JANE VICENS | Trustee | 19 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE ELIZABETH SOMERVILLE | Trustee | 14 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER A LEACH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.