Trustees BROUGHTON GIFFORD VILLAGE HALL
Charity number: 305477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Childe | Chair | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Rees | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Monk | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Robert Giles | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Francis | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kate Hooper | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Childe | Trustee | 13 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Martin Cottle | Trustee | 11 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MERVYN REES | Trustee | 13 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
AMY HARLAND | Trustee | 29 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS SILVIA DAVIS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.