Trustees 1ST MILTON (WESTON SUPER MARE) SCOUT GROUP
Charity number: 305641
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Van Rassel | Chair | 16 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Alex Clifford | Trustee | 05 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Vennall | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Frances White | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Jones | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Judith Haley Roberts | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Phethean-Hubble | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
CHERYL VAN RASSEL | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Wake-Brimble | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alex Scott | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Marcus Kendall | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Faye Alicia Kendall | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Walter Alan Reynolds | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Heathcote | Trustee | 03 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Kattana | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|||||
Philip Nicholson | Trustee | 01 April 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.