Trustees 1ST FETCHAM SCOUT H Q
Charity number: 305773
Charity reporting is overdue by 136 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Atkins | Chair | 05 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jill Jackson | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Harlow | Trustee | 01 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Adam John Ball | Trustee | 30 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
KAREN MARGARET IRENE JORDAN | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire McDonnell | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.