Governing document TRURO HIGH SCHOOL FOR GIRLS
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 08/04/1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 30/05/1996 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20/03/2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 17/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08/01/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/03/2013 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04/02/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT IN OR NEAR TRURO, IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL, OF A DAY AND BOARDING SCHOOL PRIMARILY FOR GIRLS BUT WHICH ALSO ADMITS BOYS INTO ITS NURSERY (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS “THE SCHOOL”).
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF CORNWALL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.