Governing document FARNEY CLOSE SCHOOL LTD
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 1954, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS 13 MAY 1995, 20 MAY 2000 AND 10 JULY 2021 as amended on 13 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity (Objects) are to promote and provide for the advancement of education and in connection therewith, to conduct, carry on, organise and develop in the United Kingdom any boarding or day school or schools for the education of children of either or both sexes but so that each such school shall be carried on as an educational charity.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.