Trustees HEADWAY CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Charity number: 1062886
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Hutchinson | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kim Mabbutt | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Gonzalez Malaga | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Emma Phillips | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Green | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gregory Dean | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gary Ian Howe | Trustee | 24 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.