Trustees RED HILL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 307891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shellina Prendergast | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||
ROBERT WILLIAM PIGGOTT | Trustee | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||||
Nicola Clark | Trustee | 16 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
PAM JONES OBE | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||||
Allan Adams | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
Kevin Moule | Trustee | 19 October 2016 |
|
|
||||||
MICHAEL STARTUP | Trustee | 20 January 2012 |
|
|||||||
ANTONY BUNTING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
BOB LAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
ROGER ROY SWIFT BARTON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.