Governing document LARKFIELD WITH HILL PARK AUTISTIC TRUST LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/08/1954 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/06/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/10/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 18/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/11/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING, PHYSICAL AND OTHER DISABILITIES INCLUDING THOSE CONSIDERED TO BE ON THE AUTISTIC SPECTRUM AND THOSE DISADVANTAGED IN SOCIETY BY ENHANCING THEIR INDEPENDENCE, POTENTIAL AND QUALITY OF LIFE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF STIMULATING, SAFE AND SUPPORTIVE ENVIRONMENTS, ACCOMMODATION, CARE AND PROGRAMMES OF TRAINING, EDUCATION AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.