Trustees MASJID E NOOR AND MADRESSAH ANWAROOL ISLAM
Charity number: 1077956
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
harun karolia | Chair | 06 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sajid Abbas Daya | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rafik Ravat | Trustee | 28 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rafik Vardalia | Trustee | 19 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gulamhussein Raje | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Lorgat | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Bodhania | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Asif Lorgat | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aadam Bulbulia | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Moosa Rawat | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Qadri | Trustee | 19 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ashraff Pandor | Trustee | 31 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Zubair Badat | Trustee | 06 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
SALIM HASAN JOGI | Trustee | 20 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
Imtiyaz Bodhania | Trustee | 27 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ebrahim Laher | Trustee | 03 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Hasan Loonat | Trustee | 19 February 1999 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.