Governing document SPRINGFIELD SCHOOL, WITNEY, PARENT TEACHERS ASSOCIATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18TH DECEMBER 1973 AS AMENDED 27TH NOVEMBER 1987, AS AMENDED AT AN AGM DATED 27 NOVEMBER 1996, AND AT SGM 2 DECEMBER 1997, AND AT SGM 6 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AT SPRINGFIELD SCHOOL BY ASSOCIATING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE COMMUNITY AT LARGE IN A COMMON EFFORT OT ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITES FOR TRAINING, RECREATION AND LESIURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE CHILDREN, BEING FACILITIES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL AUTHORITES AND, (I) OF WHICH THE CHILDREN HAVE NEED BY REASONS OF THEIR INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT AND (II) WHICH WILL IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE CHILDREN BY PROMOTING THEIR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL WELL-BEING.(I) TO FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENT AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (II) TO ENGAGE IN ACTIVITES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATON OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT; (III) TO RAISE FUNDS AND INVITE AND RECIVE CONTRIBUTIONS BY WAY OF DONATIONS OR OTHERWISE FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE ASSOCIATON.
Area of benefit
WITNEY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.