Governing document Wychwood School Charity Limited
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 5TH MAY 1943 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1951 AS AMENDED 14 MARCH 2002, AND 28 JUNE 2004. as amended on 11 Oct 2021 as amended on 28 Jul 2021 as amended on 11 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
The Objects of the Charity are for the public benefit and are specifically restricted to the advancement of the education of pupils at the School and generally of girls between the ages of 11 and 18.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.