Trustees BEACHBOROUGH SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 309910
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Barrett | Chair | 20 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Crystal Victoria Danbury | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Peters | Trustee | 20 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hemal Dilip Lodhia | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christina Hazel Lavery | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Laura Alice Whitehead | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Antony Palmer | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Mahon Tearle | Trustee | 27 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Hill | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Eilbeck | Trustee | 21 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Wood | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 11 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Mullineux | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Mrs R Donaldson | Trustee | 19 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Sanderson | Trustee | 15 November 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.