Governance MARK EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 310054
Charity reporting is overdue by 258 days
Registration history:
- 12 December 1961: Standard registration
- 09 July 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 08 December 2015: Re-registered
- 09 July 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- 02 August 2017: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- MARK CHURCH OF ENGLAND SCHOOL TRUSTEES (Working name)
- MARK SCHOOL TRUSTEES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.