Dogfen lywodraethu BROXTOWE YOUTH HOMELESSNESS
Dogfen lywodraethu
Nid dyma destun llawn dogfen lywodraethu’r elusen.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED 12 SEPTEMBER 2007 AND 20 FEBRUARY 2008 AS AMENDED ON 10/12/2015 AS AMENDED ON 18 OCT 2022 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 13 JUN 2023 as amended on 13 Oct 2022
Gwrthrychau elusennol
TO WORK TO PREVENT HOMELESSNESS AMONGT YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 16-25 YEARS WHO ARE RESIDENT OR HAVE RESIDENTIAL OR EMPLOYMENT CONNECTIONS IN THE BOROUGH OF BROXTOWE AND SURROUNDING AREAS. THE GROUP WILL ALSO WORK TO INCREASE RESOURCES AND ACCESS TO ACCOMMODATION AND TO MITIGATE THE WORST OUTCOMES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHO DO NOT BECOME HOMELESS BY INCREASING AND DEVELOPING SERVICES TO SUPPORT YOUNG HOMELESS PEOPLE BY ASSISTING WITH THE PREVENTION OF HOMELESSNESS AND PROVISION OF SUITABLE ACCOMMODATION AND SUPPORT SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Maes buddion
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE BROXTOWE
Dywedwch wrthym a ydych chi’n derbyn cwcis
Rydym yn defnyddio cwcis i gasglu gwybodaeth am y ffordd rydych chi’n defnyddio Cofrestr Elusennau a Gwasanaethau Digidol y Comisiwn Elusennau, megis y tudalennau rydych chi’n ymweld â nhw.