Trustees PATTERDALE MOUNTAIN RESCUE ASSOCIATION LIMITED
Charity number: 1063329
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof. Malcolm Joseph Jackson | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Brenan | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenn Bridge | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nigel David George Harling | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SEAN DUFFY | Trustee | 25 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Neil Barrow | Trustee | 26 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Graham Baker | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ann Childs | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ken Hardcastle | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE FREEBORN | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.