Trustees CHESHAM PREPARATORY SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 310642
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Cartledge | Chair | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Teasdale | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shahin Gulamali | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Crompton | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane O'Gorman | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Nijkamp-lyell | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Matthews | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Haycock | Trustee | 01 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Marie McNaney | Trustee | 27 June 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.