Trustees SIR ROBERT KEMP'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Charity number: 310804
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUDITH M'ELLIGOTT | Chair |
|
|
|||||
ALISON STANGER | Trustee | 16 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Tatiana Kavanagh | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emma Marie Hammond | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Ann Mynott-Drane | Trustee | 13 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALEC JAMES | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.