Trustees PARKSIDE SCHOOL TRUST
Charity number: 312041
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBIN SOUTHWELL | Chair | 28 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Cheeseman | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Janet Crane | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Davies | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Pask | Trustee | 15 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Karen Keane | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Wood | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
CELIA GREGORY | Trustee | 24 May 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.