Governing document ISLEWORTH BLUE SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 4TH MARCH 1955 AS AMENDED BY SCHEMES DATED 13TH MAY 1969, 8TH NOVEMBER 1983 AND 16TH SEPTEMBER 1991 AS AMENDED ON 25 APR 2016
Charitable objects
A VOLUNTARY SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS 1944 TO 1953, WHEREIN RELIGIOUS INSTRUCTION SHALL BE GIVEN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE SUPPORT THEREOF. AWARD OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES FOR FURTHER EDUCATION FOR PUPILS OF ISLEWORTH GRAMMAR SCHOOL FOR BOYS OR THE ISLEWORTH GREEN SCHOOL FOR GIRLS, OR ISLEWORTH BLUE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL, IF SUCH PUPILS ARE RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREA, PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE TO ENABLE THEM TO ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE OR CALLING.IF AND IN SO FAR AS INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN MANNNER AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY THE SAME FOR THE BENEFIT OF ISLEWORTH GREEN SCHOOL
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF ISLEWORTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.