Trustees WALSINGHAM COLLEGE (AFFILIATED SCHOOLS) LIMITED
Charity number: 312638
Charity is insolvent
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Revd Canon Vanessa Baron | Chair | 12 June 2014 |
|
|||||||||||
Dr Brian John Taylor Hanson | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
RUTH SUZANNE WARD | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Sir Richard Mantle OBE DL | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Rev Graeme Rowlands | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Mary Thorne | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Rev Guy Willis | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Lynn Trigg | Trustee | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
Timothy Stephen Day | Trustee | 06 November 2014 |
|
|
||||||||||
RICHARD ABRAHAM | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
Andrew Lee | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.