Trustees ADDEY AND STANHOPE SCHOOL
Charity number: 312693
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Philip | Chair | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chenai Mutuma | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Schramm | Trustee | 26 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nickole Peterkin | Trustee | 06 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rob Watt | Trustee | 28 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Rowbotham | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Chinelo Chukwunyere | Trustee | 01 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brandon Charleston | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Claire LeHur | Trustee | 12 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Charlene Noel | Trustee | 13 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Coker-Adeleke | Trustee | 07 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Babara Smith | Trustee | 05 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Paul Trynka | Trustee | 28 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Jan Shapiro | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
ZAIDA FLORIAN | Trustee | 07 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel Atuah | Trustee | 04 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JAMES POLLARD | Trustee |
|
||||||
BERYL ROBERTS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PATRICIA BILLINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.