Trustees ARNOLD HOUSE SCHOOL LTD
Charity number: 312725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUMITA HONEY | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Grenier | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Monish Sahni | Trustee | 15 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hanah Burgess | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gary Savage | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
JON HAMILTON ZEHNER | Trustee | 02 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Judith De Freitas | Trustee | 13 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claudia Mary Seton Douglass | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
REVD DR ANDERS KARIM BERGQUIST | Trustee |
|
||||||
DR MICHELE PATRICIA BADENOCH | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.