Trustees THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION FOR GIFTED CHILDREN
Charity number: 313182
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Ramsden | Chair | 21 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Rhys Christopher Jones | Trustee | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anil Joshi | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lorraine Fellows | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Branka Young | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Frederick Dipper | Trustee | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joy Morgan | Trustee | 14 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.