Charity overview CLAUDIUS MILES AVERILL ENDOWMENT
Charity number: 700640-3
Removed charity
Governing document
SCHEME OF 9 NOVEMBER 1984.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR INCOME ON MAKING AWARDS OF MONEY OR IN KIND TO PUPILS OF THE KING EDWARD VI HIGH SCHOOL, STAFFORD, IN FURTHERANCE OF FIELD STUDIES, IN ACCORDANCE WITH RULES MADE FROM TIME TO TIME BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 23 September 1988: Standard registration
- 29 August 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 01 September 1997: Standard registration
- 23 August 2002: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 23 August 2002: Funds transferred to 700640 KING EDWARD VI HIGH SCHOOL STAFFORD AMENITIES AND ...
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.