Trustees SCOLMA (THE UK LIBRARIES AND ARCHIVES GROUP ON AFRICA)
Charity number: 325086
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr MARION WALLACE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ben Carson | Trustee | 23 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mariam de Haan | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Haines | Trustee | 29 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Sambrook | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Charles Fonge | Trustee | 10 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jenni Skinner | Trustee | 11 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Hewitt | Trustee | 05 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALISON METCALFE | Trustee | 16 January 2012 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA SPINA | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SARAH RHODES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCY MCCANN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAWN WRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERRY BARRINGER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.