Accounts and annual returns THE MIRIAM ROTHSCHILD AND JOHN FOSTER HUMAN RIGHTS TRUST
Charity number: 327301
Charity reporting is overdue by 1632 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 171 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 171 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 536 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 536 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 901 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 901 days | |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1265 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Overdue | Overdue by 1265 days | |
Annual return | 28 February 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1632 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2019 | Overdue | Overdue by 1632 days |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window