Governing document WHITE PARISH AND LANDFORD LINK SCHEME
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 6 MARCH 1997 AS AMENDED 8 MAY 1997 AND 21 JUNE 1997 CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 08/01/2015 as amended on 11 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A PROMPT AND CARING SERVICE TO RELIEVE POOR, SICK, ELDERLY OR DISABLED PERSONS IN THE VILLAGES OF WHITEPARISH, LANDFORD AND ANY ADJOINING VILLAGES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
WHITEPARISH, LANDFORD AND ANY ADJOINING VILLAGES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.