Trustees THE ROLLRIGHT TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1068450
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE HENRY LAMBRICK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Daniel Charles Benedict Poore | Trustee | 21 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Wendy Kelly | Trustee | 04 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robert Charles Allen | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Palmer | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ambereene Hitchcox | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|||||
Margaret Ann Harper | Trustee | 15 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ron Dudley Smith | Trustee | 13 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
ROBIN SMITTEN | Trustee | 23 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID BRYAN SHIRT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.