Trustees AFRICA LANDS TRUST
Charity number: 1072068
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Murden | Chair | 08 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Chandler Saint | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Keith Maurice Wilson | Trustee | 17 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
GERARD MCCORMICK | Trustee | 03 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Patricia Ann Harris | Trustee | 04 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Raymond Nicholson | Trustee | 02 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.