Governing document COMA (CONTEMPORARY MUSIC FOR ALL)
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/09/1997 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/03/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/11/2012 as amended on 14 Oct 2020 as amended on 15 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE ART OF MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR TO ENCOURAGE AMATEUR MUSICIANS TO TAKE AN ACTIVE PART IN CONTEMPORARY MUSIC-MAKING.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.