Governing document Grimsby and Cleethorpes Amateur Operatic Society
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 AUGUST 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 MAY 1998 CERTIFICATE OF CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 AUGUST 1996 AND 11 AUGUST 1997 as amended on 11 Aug 1997
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION, KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN ARTS OF OPERA , MUSIC AND SINGING OR ANY ONE OR MORE OF THOSE ARTS SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE FOUNDATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.