Accounts and annual returns GREAT PONTON VILLAGE CENTRE
Charity number: 1067755
Charity reporting is overdue by 443 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 77 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 77 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 443 days | |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 01 July 2021 | 31 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 01 July 2021 | 396 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window