Trustees VOLUNTEER CORNWALL
Charity number: 1069957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Rebecca Magill | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Hall | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan David Miles Price | Trustee | 19 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natercia Hughes | Trustee | 21 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr MICHAEL LEYSHON | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR CATHERINE SYLVIA LEYSHON | Trustee | 14 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANET POPHAM | Trustee | 18 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Linda Emmett | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.