Accounts and annual returns ASAHOLAH MINISTRIES OF GOD
Charity number: 1069779
Charity reporting is overdue by 970 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 240 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Overdue | Overdue by 240 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 605 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 605 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 13 April 2022 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Overdue | Overdue by 970 days | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 215 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 03 July 2021 | 215 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 12 December 2019 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 12 December 2019 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window