Governance DESTINY CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES
Charity number: 1070364
Charity reporting is overdue by 1020 days
Registration history:
- 02 July 1998: Standard registration
- 16 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 11 November 2009: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 June 2015: Re-registered
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
- DESTINY WORSHIP CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.